Accounts and annual returns MS POSITIVE

Charity Number: 1175850
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 October 2022 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 October 2021 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 August 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required