Trustees LLANMADOC AND CHERITON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 510359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Gale Lloyd Trustee 20 January 2025
None on record
Wilma Rose Thomas Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Natalia Bruno-Thomas Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Robert Brynley Lewis Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Marie-Alaina Turner Trustee 27 January 2023
None on record
Gee Dynamos Trustee 02 April 2018
None on record
Janis Ann Wheeler Trustee 31 March 1989
None on record
RHIAN HELEN DAVIES Trustee
None on record
LYNDA MAUREEN JENKINS Trustee
None on record