Trustees THE MANCHESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY NURSES FELLOWSHIP
Charity number: 510418

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Thonet | Chair | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Cook | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Turner | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Enid Joanne Dawrant | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liz Walker | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Booth | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL HELMER | Trustee | 21 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE HEWITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN HARRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE CLINNING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET RISTE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.