Financial history INSPIRED FUTURES

Charity Number: 1176201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £87.16k £60.94k £34.78k £60.00k £122.92k
Total expenditure £81.57k £103.24k £31.98k £52.00k £109.71k
Income from government contracts N/A £29.67k N/A N/A £68.00k
Income from government grants £30.00k N/A N/A £46.00k £7.20k