Trustees SAMARITANS OF STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1173572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norman William Bridges Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Michael David Clarke Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Alexandra Harrison Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Cassandra Hill Trustee 26 October 2023
None on record
Joseph Robert Potts Trustee 26 October 2023
None on record
Lynne Bailey Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Sarah katherine Evans Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record