Financial history FAVERSHAM AND VILLAGES REFUGEE SOLIDARITY GROUP

Charity Number: 1180448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.64k £11.24k £16.71k £14.40k £10.64k
Total expenditure £9.54k £9.08k £14.20k £18.28k £10.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A