Financial history FRIENDS OF FACE 2 FACE CORNWALL

Charity number: 1176334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.93k £5.23k £4.34k £3.89k £3.69k
Total expenditure £11.86k £6.51k £3.87k £3.99k £3.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A