Accounts and annual returns FIRST HOPE FAMILIES

Charity number: 1175250
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 April 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 April 2024 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 June 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 June 2023 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 June 2023 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 June 2023 486 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 June 2023 851 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 June 2023 851 days late Download Open in new window