Linked charities SAMARITANS OF PORTSMOUTH AND EAST HAMPSHIRE
Charity Number: 1173720

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
RULES AS AMENDED ON THE 17 JULY 1967, 14 OCTOBER 1992, 5 APRIL 1993, 25 APRIL 1994. FURTHER AMENDED BY REVISED CONSTITUTIONS ADOPTED 5 MARCH 1996, 29 APRIL 2003 AND 27 APRIL 2004 AND 23 NOVEMBER 2006.
AS AMENDED ON 24 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
(I) TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE PORTSMOUTH AND EAST HAMPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS; AND
(II) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH AND EAST HAMPSHIRE
Registration history
- 16 August 1967 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.