Accounts and annual returns CROWD SCHOLAR

Charity number: 1174788
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 January 2025 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 March 2025 130 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 January 2025 453 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 March 2025 496 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 November 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 January 2025 818 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window