Financial history BRANT BROUGHTON PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 510579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.38k £5.64k £12.23k £11.87k £24.67k
Total expenditure £9.00k £6.95k £5.82k £11.59k £15.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £3.91k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.92k £500 £6.84k