Accounts and annual returns READY STEADY GROW COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1174318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 July 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 July 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window