Governing document BEECHWOOD VILLAGE COMMUNITY TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUL 2023 as amended on 17 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE AREA FORMERLY COMMONLY KNOWN AS CRAYLANDS IN BASILDON, ESSEX INCLUDING THAT PART WHICH HAS BEEN SUBJECT TO REGENERATION AND HAS BEEN RENAMED BEECHWOOD VILLAGE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.