Accounts and annual returns CAERPHILLY BOROUGH CHURCHES NIGHT SHELTER

Charity number: 1175045
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 08 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 08 October 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 October 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Annual return 08 October 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 October 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 08 October 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 October 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 March 2020 On Time