Financial history WALES COMMUNITY THEATRE PLAYERS

Charity number: 1175705
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.92k £3.92k £38.04k £48.32k £27.64k
Total expenditure £43.27k £4.33k £31.09k £49.19k £21.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100 £504 £1.74k £700 £797