Financial history MONK SHERBORNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1175663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £32.48k £104.99k £310.99k £27.66k £24.42k
Total expenditure £5.98k £18.58k £414.49k £20.29k £22.01k
Income from government contracts £320 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.19k £48.61k £180.00k N/A £1.50k