Accounts and annual returns PRICKLEBUMS HEDGEHOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1176982
Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 20 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 05 July 2023 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 05 July 2023 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 02 May 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 02 May 2022 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 May 2022 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 May 2022 397 days late Download Open in new window