Financial history THE BARROW PARISH PLAYING FIELDS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 510891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.51k £11.23k £15.17k £3.86k £7.36k
Total expenditure £2.38k £1.48k £8.67k £5.87k £4.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.67k N/A N/A