Financial history THE FRIENDS OF PONTESBURY LIBRARY

Charity Number: 1176789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £12.38k £7.55k £7.29k £9.57k £5.99k
Total expenditure £9.73k £6.18k £7.19k £6.24k £5.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A