Financial history HEREFORD HOSPITAL RADIO SERVICE

Charity number: 510972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.14k £8.95k £14.78k £9.63k £2.49k
Total expenditure £3.29k £10.68k £4.32k £7.39k £16.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.66k N/A N/A N/A N/A