Accounts and annual returns BLOOMSBURY NETWORK

Charity number: 1177326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 31 May 2024 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 31 May 2024 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 06 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 06 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 April 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 April 2022 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 March 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window