Financial history FRIENDS OF ARUNDEL CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1175802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £8.55k £1.33k £8.41k £16.55k £16.56k
Total expenditure £13.84k £849 £2.44k £5.31k £5.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A