Accounts and annual returns THE BALLANTYNE COLLECTION

Charity number: 511021
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 28 August 2012 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 13 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 09 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required