Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF TOTTENHALL AND ST. MICHAEL AT BOWES SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1176088
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 September 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required