Accounts and annual returns THE UK MINDS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1177631
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 09 April 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Annual return 09 April 2019 28 March 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2019 Not submitted