Financial history HAMSTERLEY TRAILBLAZERS

Charity number: 1175497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2019 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023
Total gross income £21.25k £14.22k £9.29k £11.44k £36.67k
Total expenditure £15.37k £6.42k £16.46k £9.49k £13.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.00k £3.35k £250 N/A