Financial history BRITISH BRAIN BEE

Charity Number: 1175560
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (274 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £18 £291 £847 £0 £637
Total expenditure £575 £4.40k £674 £1.43k £1.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A