Trustees THE SOUTH COAST ANATOLIAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1177113

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAHIN CEBECI | Chair | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aziz Yalcin | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Serkan Cokakbas | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Chilingir | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenan Tefik Baytar | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mustafa Gulek | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roji Aksoy | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ekrem Selamet | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dogan Yalcin | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shahin Hajiyev | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cumali Tut | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ercument Selamet | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Demir | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMET KOSE | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
HASAN YILMAZ | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MURAT KOSE | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.