Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN TEDI TWT

Charity number: 1175575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £69.20k £58.47k £91.04k £72.85k £110.31k
Total expenditure £68.28k £61.61k £68.47k £90.18k £118.04k
Income from government contracts N/A £43.04k £77.78k £34.75k £63.64k
Income from government grants £49.42k N/A N/A £30.34k £34.46k