Accounts and annual returns THE NEW FOREST MARATHON COMMUNITY FUND

Charity number: 1176268
Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 November 2022 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 November 2022 382 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window