Financial history BILTON GRANGE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1179913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £14.10k £3.43k £1.49k £800 £1.05k
Total expenditure £13.88k £130 £630 £326 £300
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A