Accounts and annual returns THE LEDGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177055
Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
Annual return 10 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 627 days
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 627 days
Annual return 10 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 992 days
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 992 days
Annual return 10 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1357 days
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1357 days
Annual return 10 November 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days