Accounts and annual returns CHELLASTON JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIEND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1175655
Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days
Annual return 21 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days
Annual return 21 September 2021 22 April 2025 1006 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 21 September 2020 07 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 21 September 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2019 Not Required