Financial history FRIENDS OF HONLEY JUNIOR, INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1175936
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £15.33k £15.49k £3.94k £12.76k £12.76k
Total expenditure £18.45k £5.05k £11.61k £17.22k £17.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £700 N/A