Financial history ROSIE'S RAINBOW PANTRY

Charity Number: 1177172
Charity reporting is up to date (220 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £23.68k £12.04k £5.74k £22.80k £15.89k
Total expenditure £6.06k £3.89k £3.70k £5.58k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A