Financial history FRESHSTART SMART

Charity number: 1178047
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £281 £14.95k £4.11k £33.34k £22.70k
Total expenditure £343 £10.77k £3.94k £22.38k £32.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.22k N/A