Financial history OAKWOOD TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1175910
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022 01/05/2023 01/05/2024
Total gross income £91.61k £46.93k £53.82k £58.90k £53.19k
Total expenditure £71.24k £77.99k £32.37k £54.51k £26.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A