Financial history TALK SURREY CIO

Charity number: 1176014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £75.97k £78.51k £74.80k £72.24k £93.82k
Total expenditure £80.63k £71.24k £78.15k £88.22k £73.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £7.00k £60.42k £8.00k £8.02k