Financial history FRIENDS OF MARLDON PRIMARY SCHOOL (FOMPS)

Charity number: 1176694
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023 30/12/2024
Total gross income £2.46k £21.89k £3.33k £616 £0
Total expenditure £1.94k £1.94k £16.48k £9.82k £2.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A