Financial history DOCOMOMO.UK

Charity number: 1178075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.02k £4.31k £1.66k £5.64k £8.92k
Total expenditure £5.94k £4.46k £4.14k £15.49k £15.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A