Accounts and annual returns MEOPHAM U3A

Charity number: 1177639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 02 May 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 April 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required