Financial history LEVINE FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022 01/05/2023 01/05/2024
Total gross income £725 £855.00k £150 £865.86k £800.15k
Total expenditure £96.00k £476.35k £429.56k £731.56k £815.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £855.00k N/A £830.00k £800.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £35.86k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £800.15k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £476.35k N/A £731.56k £815.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £33.54k N/A £38.26k £15.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £602.48k £727.05k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0