Financial history ST BEDE'S PTFA

Charity number: 1176999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.37k £1.53k £3.24k £0 £8
Total expenditure £5.60k £5.89k £1.35k £3.40k £463
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A