Financial history HAROLD JOHNSON MEMORIAL PRIZE AT THE LITTLEMOSS HIGH SCHOOL FOR BOYS

Charity number: 511578
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £10 £10 £9 £7 £4
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A