Accounts and annual returns Illogan School PTFA

Charity Number: 1177320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required