Financial history CROUCH END & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1178165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.69k £22.37k £13.99k £23.77k £32.94k
Total expenditure £19.46k £10.28k £16.96k £26.83k £28.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A