Accounts and annual returns THE FLORENCE EXHIBITION

Charity number: 511630
Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 April 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 April 2023 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 April 2023 788 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required