Financial history GOD'S WILL CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1181662
Charity reporting is up to date (138 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £13.36k £11.00k £10.01k £11.93k £10.92k
Total expenditure £16.34k £8.80k £8.50k £9.21k £8.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A