Financial history GLOBAL HEALTH FILM INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1179829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £285.83k £156.54k £49.39k £76.01k £80.36k
Total expenditure £155.20k £140.83k £49.14k £75.92k £80.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A