Financial history BOLDON AND CLEADON COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1177203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.52k £35.88k £29.00k £44.13k £42.77k
Total expenditure £16.79k £18.78k £18.67k £22.75k £29.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.87k £24.43k £10.67k £6.28k £250